Multiplication Shortcut for 2 Digit Numbers

Manostaxx

The text that follows is owned by the site above referred.

Here is only a small part of the article, for more please follow the link

SOURCE: https://www.easycalculation.com/math-facts/multiplication-shortcut-for-two-digit-numbers.html

This trick can be applied when

– First digit of both the numbers (multiplicand and multiplier) are same.

– Sum of their second digits equals 10.

Example: 23 x 27

In the above example, as first digit of both the numbers are 2 and sum on second digits (3+7) is 10 we can use this trick.

Follow the simple steps to learn the shortcut trick

Step 1: Take the first digit, add it with one and multiply the resultant value with the same.

= (2+1) x 2 = 6

Step 2: Multiply the second digits of both the numbers.

= 3×7 = 21

Step 3: Now join and write the step 1 and step 2 result together. That is the answer. So 23 x 27 = 621

With few more examples,

Example 1: 92 x 98

(9 + 1) x 9 = 90

2 x 8 = 16

Answer is 92 x 98 = 9016

Example 2: 77 x 73

(7 + 1) x 7 = 56

7 x 3 = 21

Answer is 77 x 73 = 5621

Example 3: 85 x 85

(8 + 1) x 8 = 72

5 x 5 = 25

Answer is 85 x 85 = 7225

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *